Global Patent Index - EP 0902181 A3

EP 0902181 A3 2001-12-12 - Variable-discharge-rate high-pressure pump

Title (en)

Variable-discharge-rate high-pressure pump

Title (de)

Hochdruckpumpe mit variabler Durchflussrate

Title (fr)

Pompe à haute pression à débit variable

Publication

EP 0902181 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98117065 A

Priority

JP 26498897 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0902181A2] An object of this invention is to reduce the drive torque required by a variable-discharge-rate high-pressure pump. The reduction in the drive torque enhances the durability of a timing belt used in a mechanism for power transmission to the high-pressure pump. The high-pressure pump has a plurality of cylinders (2a, 2b). A pair of plungers (21a, 21c) are disposed in the cylinder (2a). A pair of plungers (21b, 21d) are disposed in the cylinder (2b). A pressure chamber (23a) is defined between opposing end surfaces of the plungers (21a, 21c). A pressure chamber (23b) is defined between opposing end surfaces of the plungers (21b, 21d). Low-pressure fuel which is metered by an electromagnetic valve (6) for flow rate control is sequentially fed to the pressure chambers (23a, 23b). An inner cam (8) is provided which drives the plungers (21a, 21b, 21c, 21d). The inner cam (8) is common to the plungers (21a, 21b, 21c, 21d). Fuel pressurization and fuel pumping are alternately implemented in the pressure chambers (23a, 23b) in accordance with rotation of the inner cam (8). According to the alternate fuel pressurization and fuel pumping, the peak value of the drive torque required by the high-pressure pump can be reduced. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 41/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 39/02 (2006.01); F02M 41/14 (2006.01); F02M 63/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 41/1411 (2013.01); F02M 39/02 (2013.01); F02M 41/1427 (2013.01); F02M 63/0225 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0902181 A2 19990317; EP 0902181 A3 20011212; EP 0902181 B1 20031217; DE 69820550 D1 20040129; DE 69820550 T2 20041104

INPADOC legal status


2015-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140909

2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150401

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140909

2015-06-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150529

2015-05-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140909

2015-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69820550

2013-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130925

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130919

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130919

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130919

- Year of fee payment: 16

2005-06-29 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-12-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040920

2004-07-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-04-21 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2004-01-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69820550 P 20040129

2004-01-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-12-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-12-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021028

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2002-04-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020215

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-03-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI