Global Patent Index - EP 0902184 A3

EP 0902184 A3 2000-03-22 - Method for manufacturing an intake muffler, particularly for compression circuits for refrigeration systems and the like

Title (en)

Method for manufacturing an intake muffler, particularly for compression circuits for refrigeration systems and the like

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Schalldämpfers für die Einlassöffnung besonders geeignet für Kompressionskreisläufe in Kühlanlagen

Title (fr)

Procédé de production d'un amortisseur de son pour une ouverture d'admission de fluide partculièrement adapté pour des circuits de compression des installations de réfrigération

Publication

EP 0902184 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98115986 A

Priority

IT MI972073 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0902184A2] A method for manufacturing intake mufflers, particularly for compression circuits for refrigeration systems and the like, comprising the steps of: molding a cover (2) and a base (1) of an intake muffler; and mutually assembling the base (1) and the cover (2) in a mold inside which a perimetric profile is formed which is adapted to form a retention joint (3) which is molded perimetrically at the edge where the base (1) and the cover (2) are mutually coupled. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 39/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 39/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 39/0072 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0902184 A2 19990317; EP 0902184 A3 20000322; EP 0902184 B1 20050420; DE 69829810 D1 20050525; DE 69829810 T2 20060302; ES 2242252 T3 20051101; IT 1295020 B1 19990427; IT MI972073 A1 19990311

INPADOC legal status


2010-01-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080826

2009-10-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080826

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090303

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080825

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050420

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080228

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080228

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080228

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-06-16 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2006-04-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050825

2006-04-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060123

2005-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2242252 T3

2005-08-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050825

2005-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69829810 P 20050525

2005-04-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2005-04-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-02-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040107

2000-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000825

2000-03-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 04B 39/00 A, 7B 29C 67/00 B

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-03-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI