Global Patent Index - EP 0902192 B1

EP 0902192 B1 2003-06-11 - Volute casing pump

Title (en)

Volute casing pump

Title (de)

Spiralgehäusepumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe à carter en volute

Publication

EP 0902192 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98115674 A

Priority

DE 19740590 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0902192A2] A housing for a centrifugal pump has a double spiral shape formed by two or more equal length ribs (8,9) around the impeller. The ribs are separated by gaps (10,11) between the ribs and between the last rib and the edge (4) of the outlet duct. The leading edge (12,13) of a rib is at a smaller radius than the trailing edge of the preceding rib. The angle subtended by a rib is between 0.7 and 1.1 times 360 degrees divided by twice the rib count.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 29/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/445 (2013.01); F04D 29/448 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0902192 A2 19990317; EP 0902192 A3 19990714; EP 0902192 B1 20030611; AT 242845 T 20030615; BR 9803538 A 19991123; DE 19740590 A1 19990318; US 6146095 A 20001114

INPADOC legal status


2018-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170831

2018-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170820

2018-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20180301

2018-05-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20180430

2018-04-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170820

2018-03-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59808677

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160825

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160830

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160907

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-08-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-06-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040312

2004-04-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-10-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-08-20 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030820

2003-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59808677 P 20030717

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT NL

2003-06-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030611

2003-06-11 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030611

2002-09-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020731

2000-03-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR GB IT NL

2000-03-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991221

1999-07-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-07-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT NL

1999-03-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI