Global Patent Index - EP 0902236 A3

EP 0902236 A3 2000-10-11 - Glow plug

Title (en)

Glow plug

Title (de)

Glühkerze

Title (fr)

Bougie à incandescence

Publication

EP 0902236 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98117067 A

Priority

  • JP 23336298 A
  • JP 26791797 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0902236A2] A glow plug used in diesel engines is provided which includes a plug housing, a heater casing, and a heating element. The heating element consists of a heating coil and a current-controlling coil connected in series with the heating coil to control the current flowing to the heating coil. The heater casing has disposed therein the heating coil and the current-controlling coil and is inserted partially into the housing from an open end thereof. The heater casing includes a small-diameter portion and a large-diameter portion connected in series with the small-diameter portion. The whole of the large-diameter portion is disposed within the housing in tight engagement therewith, while the whole of the small-diameter portion projects from the open end of the housing for producing a clearance with an inner wall of a glow plug mount hole formed in an engine head to minimize the heat transfer from the heating element to the engine head. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23Q 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23Q 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23Q 7/001 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[X] DE 4001296 A1 19900816 - JIDOSHA KIKI CO [JP]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0902236 A2 19990317; EP 0902236 A3 20001011; EP 0902236 B1 20050413; DE 69829715 D1 20050519; DE 69829715 T2 20060427; ES 2242256 T3 20051101; JP 3551032 B2 20040804; JP H11148647 A 19990602

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091012

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-07 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20091216

2010-04-07 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Effective date: 20091216

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090903

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20091006

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090909

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-03-08 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: BERU AG

- Effective date: 20060113

2006-02-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2242256 T3

2005-05-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69829715 P 20050519

2005-04-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2005-04-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021114

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001123

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

1999-03-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI