Global Patent Index - EP 0902237 A3

EP 0902237 A3 2000-09-20 - Combustor swirler with twisted vanes

Title (en)

Combustor swirler with twisted vanes

Title (de)

Verwundene Drallschaufeln für eine Brennkammer

Title (fr)

Vrille avec des aubes tordues pour chambre de combustion

Publication

EP 0902237 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98116591 A

Priority

JP 24547797 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0902237A2] Pre-mixture forming swirler in gas turbine pre-mixed flame type low NOx combustor is improved so as to accelerate mixing of fuel and air and to prevent occurrence of flame stagnation and burning of component. Three-dimensional swirler is constructed such that swirler vane (101a) is twisted from hub side thereof to tip side so that fitting angle ( beta ) of the tip side relative to fuel nozzle (102) center axis (C) is larger than that ( alpha ) of the hub side. Thereby, while the angle ( alpha ) of the hub side is set smaller so that flame stagnation and burning of components resulted therefrom may be prevented from occurring, the angle ( beta ) of the tip side may be selected so that shearing flow necessary for appropriate mixing of fuel (F) and air (A) is obtained, thus favorable pre-mixing is done, life deterioration due to the burning etc. is prevented and combustion efficiency is enhanced. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23R 3/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23R 3/14 (2006.01); F23R 3/20 (2006.01); F23R 3/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23R 3/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0902237 A2 19990317; EP 0902237 A3 20000920; EP 0902237 B1 20031203; CA 2246219 A1 19990310; CA 2246219 C 20021119; DE 69820183 D1 20040115; DE 69820183 T2 20040826; JP H1183016 A 19990326

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170830

- Year of fee payment: 20

2005-04-20 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040902

2004-12-10 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-11-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040906

2004-09-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040902

2004-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-01-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69820183 P 20040115

2003-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-12-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-12-03 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031203

2003-12-03 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031203

2003-12-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031203

2003-12-03 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031203

2003-05-02 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: COMBUSTOR COMPRISING SWIRLER WITH TWISTED VANES

2002-11-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020924

2001-06-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980929

1999-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1999-03-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI