Global Patent Index - EP 0902239 A3

EP 0902239 A3 2001-04-25 - Fluid actuated pressure control device

Title (en)

Fluid actuated pressure control device

Title (de)

Flüssigkeitsgesteuerte Druckhaltevorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de maintien de pression à commande par fluide

Publication

EP 0902239 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98114439 A

Priority

DE 19740358 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0902239A2] A first valve (15) in the circuit also provides degassing. When pressure drops below a minimum operating pressure in the water circuit (21), a mechanical bypass valve (19) closes automatically. The pump (14) and the bypass valve are matched to one another so that, during a degassing procedure is a storage tank (22), a normal pressure is obtained when the first valve is open.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24D 3/06; F24D 19/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24D 3/02 (2006.01); F24D 3/06 (2006.01); F24D 19/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24D 19/083 (2013.01); F24D 3/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0902239 A2 19990317; EP 0902239 A3 20010425; CZ 290696 B6 20020911; CZ 9802767 A3 20000315; DE 19740358 A1 19990401; DE 19740358 C2 20010308; PL 328543 A1 19990301

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030301

2002-01-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010818

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: REFLEX WINKELMANN + PANNHOFF GMBH + CO.

1999-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-03-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI