Global patent index - EP 0902242 A3

EP 0902242 A3 2000-11-22 - Method of operating a refrigeration apparatus

Title (en)

Method of operating a refrigeration apparatus

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Betreiben eines Kältegerätes

Title (fr)

Procédé de fonctionnement d'un appareil frigorifique

Publication

EP 0902242 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98117162 A

Priority

DE 19740190 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0902242A2] The air temperature within the refrigerator or freezer cabinet is maintained within prescribed limits by switching on the compressor at an upper temperature limit for a predetermined period and operating intermittently at a predetermined ratio according to the mean temperature required to reach the minimum operating temperature.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25B 49/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25B 49/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25B 49/022 (2013.01); F25B 2600/0251 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0902242 A2 19990317; EP 0902242 A3 20001122; DE 19740190 A1 19990318

INPADOC legal status

2004-09-22 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20040729

2004-01-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-05-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030325

2001-08-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE DK ES FR GB IT SE

2001-08-08 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 19981001

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001206

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 19981001

1999-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT SE

1999-03-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 981001