Global Patent Index - EP 0902250 A3

EP 0902250 A3 2000-09-27 - Mobile body for the destruction of underwater structures

Title (en)

Mobile body for the destruction of underwater structures

Title (de)

Laufkörper zum Zerstören von Unterwasserstrukturen

Title (fr)

Engin mobile pour la destruction de structures sous-marines

Publication

EP 0902250 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98116630 A

Priority

DE 19740279 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0902250A2] Charges are parts of the traveling body and/or active bodies (10) which are spaced from each other on the target or at least in their initial position are spaced (13) from each other. The target (5) is attacked over at least one linear grid. The active bodies are preferably arranged in a lattice structure or in parallel strips.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 12/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63G 7/02 (2006.01); F42B 12/66 (2006.01); F42B 22/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 12/66 (2013.01); B63G 7/02 (2013.01); F42B 22/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0902250 A2 19990317; EP 0902250 A3 20000927; EP 0902250 B1 20040211; DE 19740279 A1 19990318

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050401

2005-02-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041112

2005-01-28 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-08-11 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040211

2004-05-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040522

2004-05-11 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040511

2004-03-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59810736 P 20040318

2004-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2004-02-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-02-11 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040211

2004-02-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040211

2004-02-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040211

2003-10-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DIEHL STIFTUNG & CO. KG

2002-11-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021001

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000830

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 42B 12/66 A

1999-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1999-03-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI