Global patent index - EP 0902497 A3

EP 0902497 A3 2000-03-29 - Resonator with adjustable resonance frequency

Title (en)

Resonator with adjustable resonance frequency

Title (de)

Resonator mit einstellbarer Resonanzfrequenz

Title (fr)

Résonateur à fréquence de résonance ajustable

Publication

EP 0902497 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98116983 A

Priority

DE 19740003 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0902497A2] The resonator has a pair of conductor paths (L1,L2) which are electrically connected together at a number of spaced points. One or more of the connections (V) can be interrupted in dependence on the required resonator frequency. One of the conductor paths (L1) can be provided by a microstrip or a stripline, with the connections provided by circuit board through connections. The other conductor path (L2) is connected to a reference potential (M).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01P 7/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01P 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01P 7/082 (2013.01); H01P 7/084 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XY] US 5105175 A 19920414 - KALTENECKER ROBERT S [US]
  • [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 6, no. 173 (E - 129) 7 September 1982 (1982-09-07)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 18, no. 577 (E - 1625) 4 November 1994 (1994-11-04)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 14, no. 257 (E - 0936) 4 June 1990 (1990-06-04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0902497 A2 19990317; EP 0902497 A3 20000329

INPADOC legal status

2004-09-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040225

2003-10-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030814

2001-10-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-12-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FI FR GB SE

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000417

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-04-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BEYER, STEFAN

1999-04-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SCHWAB, AXEL

1999-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB SE

1999-03-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI