Global Patent Index - EP 0902500 A3

EP 0902500 A3 2000-11-29 - Planar display apparatus

Title (en)

Planar display apparatus

Title (de)

Flache Bildanzeigevorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'affichage plat

Publication

EP 0902500 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98307316 A

Priority

US 92798497 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0902500A2] An article includes a flat panel display unit having a plurality of electrically conductive lead pads which are disposed on a surface thereof. The article further includes a microminiature planar signal transmission cable having opposite first and second ends. The first end of the cable is electrically connected to a selected amount of lead pads. The cable also has at least one support film having opposite first and second surfaces, and a thickness of less than about 0.003 inch. At least one layer of adhesive is disposed on the first surface of the support film, the adhesive having a thickness of less than about 0.001 inch. At least one preformed signal transmission conductor, having a widthwise dimension of less than about 0.002 inch, is embedded within the layer of adhesive. The article also includes means for electrically controlling the flat panel display electrically connected to the second end of the cable. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/04; H01R 23/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02F 1/1345 (2006.01); G09F 9/00 (2006.01); H01B 7/08 (2006.01); H01R 4/04 (2006.01); H01R 12/70 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/04 (2013.01); H01R 12/7076 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0902500 A2 19990317; EP 0902500 A3 20001129; JP H11167352 A 19990622

INPADOC legal status


2001-11-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010331

2001-09-20 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-08-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-03-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI