Global Patent Index - EP 0902508 A3

EP 0902508 A3 2000-10-25 - Method for connecting a loop antenna to a circuit board and an assembly thereof

Title (en)

Method for connecting a loop antenna to a circuit board and an assembly thereof

Title (de)

Verfahren zum verbinden einer Rahmenantenne mit einer Leiterplatte und deren Zusammenbau

Title (fr)

Méthode de connexion d'une antenne-cadre à un circuit imprimé et son assemblage

Publication

EP 0902508 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98307365 A

Priority

  • US 5862197 P
  • US 7306398 P
  • US 9098698 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0902508A2] A connector for use in connecting a loop antenna (32) to a circuit board (20) comprises two terminals (40) mounted in a housing (70). The ends (34,36) of the antenna are blade-like and the terminals include receptacles (44) for receiving the blade-like antenna ends. The terminals (40) are secured together by means of the housing (70) which isolates the terminals from one another and holds them together as a unit. The housing supports the terminals in mutually spaced relation corresponding to the spacing of circuit termini (24) on the board (20) to which the terminals are to be connected. A predetermined amount of solder (28) is disposed on each of the circuit termini, whereafter the terminals can be automatically positioned on the respective termini by means of the housing and be secured to the termini at the same time as other components, in a reflow soldering process. Subsequently, the ends (34,36) of the antenna are mated with the receptacles of the terminals. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 23/72; H01R 9/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/24 (2006.01); H01Q 7/00 (2006.01); H01R 12/57 (2011.01); H01R 12/71 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 12/57 (2013.01); H01R 12/718 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0902508 A2 19990317; EP 0902508 A3 20001025; JP H11163612 A 19990618

INPADOC legal status


2006-02-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050803

2005-05-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050322

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010424

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-03-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI