Global Patent Index - EP 0902602 B1

EP 0902602 B1 2001-12-05 - Device for electrically connecting a printed resistive trace on a support with the mains

Title (en)

Device for electrically connecting a printed resistive trace on a support with the mains

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum elektrischen Verbinden einer gedruckten widerstandsfähigen Leiterbahn mit dem Stromnetz

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour connecter électriquement avec le secteur, une piste résistive sérigraphiée sur un support

Publication

EP 0902602 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98402175 A

Priority

FR 9710969 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0902602A1] The printed circuit pads have an upper flat surface extension piece (16) and the conductor lengths (5a,5b) pass down through holes in the isolating section and contact the extension piece at a right angle.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 3/06; H01R 13/22; H01R 12/04; H01R 12/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05K 3/32 (2006.01); H01R 9/24 (2006.01); H01R 12/51 (2011.01); H01R 13/22 (2006.01); H05B 3/06 (2006.01); H01R 12/71 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 12/515 (2013.01); H01R 13/22 (2013.01); H05B 3/06 (2013.01); H01R 12/714 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE GB NL

EPO simple patent family

FR 2767972 A1 19990305; FR 2767972 B1 19991112; DE 69802764 D1 20020117; DE 69802764 T2 20020814; EP 0902602 A1 19990317; EP 0902602 B1 20011205; RU 2220519 C2 20031227

INPADOC legal status


2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070902

2008-08-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070930

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080401

2008-05-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070902

2008-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. *SEB

- Effective date: 20070930

2006-09-25 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060925

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-09-07 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060907

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-08-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060830

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-03-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020301

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69802764 20020117

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB NL

2001-12-05 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 05B 3/06 A, 7H 01R 13/22 B, 7H 01R 12/04 B, 7H 01R 12/32 B

2001-03-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010125

1999-12-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE GB NL

1999-06-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990329

1999-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB NL

1999-03-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI