Global Patent Index - EP 0902736 B1

EP 0902736 B1 2000-02-23 - PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR POURING OF STEEL FROM AN IMMERSION OUTLET

Title (en)

PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR POURING OF STEEL FROM AN IMMERSION OUTLET

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUSGIESSEN VON STAHL AUS EINEM TAUCHAUSGUSS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE COULEE DE L'ACIER DANS UNE RIGOLE DE COULEE IMERGEE

Publication

EP 0902736 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97926968 A

Priority

  • DE 9701093 W
  • DE 19623787 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19623787A1] The invention relates to a process and a device for controlling the flow dispersion of a molten metal, in particular steel, which is conveyed from a melt container via a first immersion outlet part which has a polygonal, oval or circular cross-section, and an intermediate member through the second immersion outlet part which has an elongate cross-section, and flows into a stationary mould to produce slabs. The process is characterised by the following steps: (a) the central volume flow is reduced in the intake region of the second outlet part; (b) at the same time the angle of expansion ( delta ) of the fluid jet is increased to such an extent that return flow in the lateral region of the intermediate member and the second immersion outlet part is substantially stopped; and (c) when the melt leaves the second immersion outlet part, it flows at a velocity profile with velocity vectors which are smaller in the opening centre than in the regions of the small faces. The device is characterised in that in the region of the central axis (I) of the immersion outlet, the intermediate member (31) and/or the intake (22) of the second immersion outlet part (21) is equipped in such a manner that the main flow of melt (S) leaving the first immersion outlet part is throttled.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 41/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/10 (2006.01); B22D 11/18 (2006.01); B22D 11/20 (2006.01); B22D 41/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 41/50 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK ES FR GB IT LU NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19623787 A1 19971211; DE 19623787 C2 19980702; AT 189868 T 20000315; AU 3164197 A 19980105; BR 9709536 A 19990810; CA 2257139 A1 19971211; CA 2257139 C 20060919; CN 1087200 C 20020710; CN 1221363 A 19990630; DE 59701153 D1 20000330; EP 0902736 A1 19990324; EP 0902736 B1 20000223; ES 2142686 T3 20000416; JP 2000502614 A 20000307; JP 3174348 B2 20010611; KR 20000016284 A 20000325; RU 2153956 C1 20000810; US 6260740 B1 20010717; WO 9746344 A1 19971211; ZA 9704485 B 19971229

INPADOC legal status


2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140529

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141202

2015-02-27 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141201

2015-02-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140529

2015-02-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59701153

- Effective date: 20141202

2015-01-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 189868 T

- Effective date: 20140529

2014-12-17 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141201

2014-12-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59701153

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130527

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-08-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130521

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130522

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120511

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-09-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100529

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100530

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100529

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110706

2011-07-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110718

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-04-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-02-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-01-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100529

2011-01-17 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2010-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SMS DEMAG A.G.

- Effective date: 20100531

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090522

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090622

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090513

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-08-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20090602

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20090513

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090521

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-02-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-05 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-04-27 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: GUZZI E RAVIZZA S.R.L.

2000-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2142686 T3

2000-03-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701153 20000330

2000-03-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000223

2000-03-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FR GB IT LU NL

2000-02-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 189868 T 20000315

2000-02-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

1999-09-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990722

1999-03-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981118

1999-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FR GB IT LU NL