Global Patent Index - EP 0902931 B1

EP 0902931 B1 2000-01-12 - CASH DISPENSER

Title (en)

CASH DISPENSER

Title (de)

GELDAUSGABEAUTOMAT

Title (fr)

DISTRIBUTEUR AUTOMATIQUE DE BILLETS

Publication

EP 0902931 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97918002 A

Priority

  • DE 9700387 W
  • DE 19609866 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19609866A1] The cash dispenser comprises a safe (18) housing at least one banknote cassette (32) and one separating device (34) for removing the banknotes from the cassette (32), a banknote dispensing compartment (50) which can be closed by a closure device (52), a conveyor for conveying banknotes from the separation device (34) to the dispensing compartment (50), a control device for controlling the separation device and conveyor, and an operating panel (14, 16) with operating elements for operating the control device. The dispensing compartment (50) is situated above the safe (18) which in a middle region of its cover surface (22) has an opening to allow the conveyor to pass through. The conveyor comprises a first conveyor section (36, 38) extending inside the safe as far as a transfer point (46) close to the opening (42) and a second conveyor section (44, 48) which can be detached from the first section and extends from the transfer point (46) as far as the dispensing compartment (50).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07D 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07D 9/00 (2006.01); G07D 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07D 11/0081 (2013.01); G07D 11/0018 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19609866 A1 19970918; DE 19609866 C2 19980730; BR 9708030 A 19990727; CN 1213451 A 19990407; EP 0902931 A1 19990324; EP 0902931 B1 20000112; JP 2000506298 A 20000523; US 6123327 A 20000926; WO 9734263 A1 19970918

INPADOC legal status


2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101001

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070303

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090529

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080303

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-01-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080304

2008-12-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081125

2008-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080303

2008-11-25 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070321

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-12-21 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-03-26 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20070326

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-03-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070323

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-03-31 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010331

2001-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010331

2000-12-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-10 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2000-08-23 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2000-04-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000316

2000-04-12 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000412

2000-04-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-03-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701012 20000217

2000-01-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI PT SE

1999-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990604

1999-03-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980903

1999-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI PT SE