Global Patent Index - EP 0902932 A4

EP 0902932 A4 2001-05-02 - ELECTRONIC ARTICLE SURVEILLANCE SYSTEM WITH CANCELLATION OF INTERFERENCE SIGNALS

Title (en)

ELECTRONIC ARTICLE SURVEILLANCE SYSTEM WITH CANCELLATION OF INTERFERENCE SIGNALS

Title (de)

ELEKTRONISCHES WARENÜBERWACHUNGSSYSTEM MIT STÖRSIGNALUNTERDRÜCKUNG

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE SURVEILLANCE ELECTRONIQUE D'ARTICLES A SUPPRESSION DES SIGNAUX D'INTERFERENCE

Publication

EP 0902932 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97924668 A

Priority

  • US 9707959 W
  • US 65694996 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9746989A1] An electronic article surveillance system (100) includes a signal generator (22, 24, 26) for generating an interrogation signal (28) in an interrogation zone (30), an antenna (36) which receives a signal (34) present in the interrogation zone (30), and circuitry for cancelling interference. A hybrid interference component cancelling loop forms a digital interference estimate signal (108) which is converted (106) into an analog estimate signal, which is subtracted (102) from an input analog signal (40). The difference signal is digitized and subjected to additional digital interference cancellation processes (108). Each of the signal processing operations (108) entails performing a polyphase decomposition of a digital input signal, estimating a mean value of each of the resulting subsequences, and combining the estimated mean values to form an interference component estimate signal. An input sample window for a comb-filtering stage is phase adjusted relative to the interrogation signal to compensate for changes in phase of the marker signal (34).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 13/187

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/2488 (2013.01); G08B 13/2471 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9746989 A1 19971211; WO 9746989 A9 20040318; AR 007520 A1 19991110; AU 3003397 A 19980105; AU 724342 B2 20000921; BR 9709659 A 19990810; CA 2249015 A1 19971211; CA 2249015 C 20040106; DE 69730026 D1 20040902; DE 69730026 T2 20050721; EP 0902932 A1 19990324; EP 0902932 A4 20010502; EP 0902932 B1 20040728; ES 2225971 T3 20050316; JP 2000511665 A 20000905; JP 3875997 B2 20070131; US 5699045 A 19971216

INPADOC legal status


2009-12-18 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1020453

2009-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080510

2009-07-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080510

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080509

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081202

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080602

2009-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090119

2009-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080509

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070517

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070525

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-07-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070702

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-05-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070528

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-07-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050429

2005-05-01 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050501

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-04-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2225971 T3

2004-10-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041028

2004-09-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69730026 P 20040902

2004-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE

2004-07-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-01-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SENSORMATIC ELECTRONICS CORPORATION

2003-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030218

2001-05-02 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010316

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE

1999-03-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981221

1999-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE