Global Patent Index - EP 0902938 B1

EP 0902938 B1 2000-04-19 - HOLDER FOR SWIVELLING PANELS OR THE LIKE

Title (en)

HOLDER FOR SWIVELLING PANELS OR THE LIKE

Title (de)

HALTER FÜR WENDETAFELN OD. DGL.

Title (fr)

SUPPORT POUR PANNEAUX PIVOTANTS OU SIMILAIRE

Publication

EP 0902938 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97926990 A

Priority

  • DE 9701155 W
  • DE 19623895 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19623895A1] A holder capable of being fixed on a wall or support column carries swivelling panels which can be hung in the area of their opposite front sides (5, 7) on pins (2) that form pairs of pins. The holder is provided in the area of a receiving cavity (19) with clamping jaws (22) that enable fitting roller-shaped inserts useful for fastening the holder to support columns.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 7/18; G09F 7/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 7/18 (2006.01); G09F 7/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 7/18 (2013.01); G09F 7/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19623895 A1 19971211; DE 19623895 C2 19990506; AT 191985 T 20000515; AU 3164797 A 19980107; AU 719729 B2 20000518; CA 2257387 A1 19971218; CA 2257387 C 20060725; DK 0902938 T3 20000821; EP 0902938 A1 19990324; EP 0902938 B1 20000419; ES 2146098 T3 20000716; JP 2001502811 A 20010227; JP 4091661 B2 20080528; NO 312985 B1 20020722; NO 985677 A 19990205; NO 985677 D0 19981204; PL 182182 B1 20011130; PL 330320 A1 19990510; RU 2176414 C2 20011127; US 6199815 B1 20010313; WO 9748087 A1 19971218

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-06 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

- Effective date: 20170602

2017-06-02 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59701473

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160630

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160614

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-06-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150602

2016-02-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 191985 T

- Effective date: 20150602

2016-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150602

2016-01-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150602

2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140530

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140522

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-08-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20140522

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-02-20 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: "DURABLE" HUNKE & JOCHHEIM GMBH & CO. KOMMANDI, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: "DURABLE" HUNKE & JOCHHEIM GMBH & CO. KG, 58636 ISERLOHN, DE

- Document: DE 59701473

- Effective date: 20140114

2014-02-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59701473

- Representative's name: BECKORD & NIEDLICH PATENTANWALTSKANZLEI, DE

- Effective date: 20140114

2014-01-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59701473

- Representative's name: BECKORD & NIEDLICH PATENTANWALTSKANZLEI, DE

2010-04-30 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20091201

2007-10-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: "DURABLE" HUNKE & JOCHHEIM GMBH & CO. KOMMANDITGE

- Free text: "DURABLE" HUNKE & JOCHHEIM GMBH & CO. KOMMANDITGESELLSCHAFT#WESTFALENSTRASSE 77-79#D-58636 ISERLOHN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- "DURABLE" HUNKE & JOCHHEIM GMBH & CO. KOMMANDITGESELLSCHAFT#WESTFALENSTRASSE 77-79#D-58636 ISERLOHN (DE)

2005-06-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050602

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-21 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2146098 T3

2000-07-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000605

2000-06-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2000-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2000-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701473 20000525

2000-04-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-04-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191985 T 20000515

1999-08-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990712

1999-03-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981127

1999-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE