Global Patent Index - EP 0903038 B1

EP 0903038 B1 2001-12-05 - Adaptive method for outputting encrypted video input data in either its encrypted format or decrypted

Title (en)

Adaptive method for outputting encrypted video input data in either its encrypted format or decrypted

Title (de)

Adaptives Verfahren zur Ausgabe verschlüsselter Videoeingangsdaten wahlweise in ihrem verschlüsselten Format oder entschlüsselt

Title (fr)

Procédé adaptatif pour retransmettre des données d'entrée vidéo chiffrées facultativement dans leur format chiffré ou déchiffré

Publication

EP 0903038 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97927747 A

Priority

  • US 9708876 W
  • US 1872296 P
  • US 76151796 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9746017A1] An adaptive decoder (25) generates a program representative datastream in selectable, encrypted or decrypted form. A method for adaptively processing input encrypted program data with an associated encryption code provides (110, 115) either an encrypted or a decrypted program output. In an encrypted mode, encrypted program data (47) and an associated encryption code is exported to an output port. In a decrypted mode, input encrypted program data is decrypted (50) using an encryption key derived from the encryption code to provide decrypted program data. The decrypted program data is exported to the output port. Non-encrypted program data is exported to an output port (95) in a selectable non-encrypted mode.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 7/16; H04N 7/167

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04N 5/92 (2006.01); G11B 27/031 (2006.01); G11B 27/10 (2006.01); G11B 27/30 (2006.01); G11B 27/32 (2006.01); H04N 7/16 (2011.01); H04N 7/167 (2011.01); H04N 21/4147 (2011.01); H04N 21/434 (2011.01); H04N 21/4405 (2011.01); H04N 21/4623 (2011.01); G11B 27/034 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 21/4147 (2013.01); G11B 27/031 (2013.01); G11B 27/102 (2013.01); G11B 27/3027 (2013.01); G11B 27/327 (2013.01); H04N 7/163 (2013.01); H04N 7/1675 (2013.01); H04N 21/434 (2013.01); H04N 21/4405 (2013.01); H04N 21/4623 (2013.01); G11B 27/034 (2013.01); G11B 27/105 (2013.01); G11B 27/107 (2013.01); G11B 27/328 (2013.01); G11B 27/329 (2013.01); G11B 2220/213 (2013.01); G11B 2220/2545 (2013.01); G11B 2220/2562 (2013.01); G11B 2220/2579 (2013.01); G11B 2220/90 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

REIMERS, U.: "Digitale Fernsehtechnik, pp.9-11, 171-176", 1995, SPRINGER-VERLAG, BERLIN, 995

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IE IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9746017 A1 19971204; AU 3213397 A 19980105; BR 9709508 A 19990810; BR 9709508 B1 20090113; CA 2256632 A1 19971204; CA 2256632 C 20041102; CN 1146233 C 20040414; CN 1226359 A 19990818; DE 69708867 D1 20020117; DE 69708867 T2 20020411; EP 0903038 A1 19990324; EP 0903038 B1 20011205; ES 2165065 T3 20020301; HK 1022067 A1 20050208; JP 2001509322 A 20010710; JP 2008252949 A 20081016; JP 4338786 B2 20091007; JP 4339388 B2 20091007; KR 20000016059 A 20000325; MY 119996 A 20050830; US 5933500 A 19990803

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160523

2018-05-07 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20180507

2017-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170521

2017-06-14 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170521

2017-05-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160522

2017-05-22 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69708867

2017-02-22 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160519

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160512

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160517

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20150512

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150413

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-09-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: THOMSON LICENSING, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, INC., INDIANAPOLIS, US

- Document: DE 69708867

- Effective date: 20120724

2012-09-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: THOMSON LICENSING, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, INC., INDIANAPOLIS, IND., US

- Document: DE 69708867

- Effective date: 20120724

2012-09-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69708867

- Representative's name: ROSSMANITH, MANFRED, DIPL.-PHYS. DR.RER.NAT., DE

- Effective date: 20120724

2012-07-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69708867

- Representative's name: MANFRED ROSSMANITH, DE

2003-01-29 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20030103

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-09-13 [REG FR D6] PATENT ENDORSED LICENCES OF RIGHTS

2002-05-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2165065 T3

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69708867 20020117

2002-01-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IE IT

2001-01-10 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: ADAPTIVE METHOD FOR OUTPUTTING ENCRYPTED VIDEO INPUT DATA IN EITHER ITS ENCRYPTED FORMAT OR DECRYPTED

2001-01-03 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: ADAPTIVE METHOD FOR OUTPUTTING ENCRYPTED VIDEO INPUT DATA IN EITHER ITS ENCRYPTED FORMAT OR DECRYPTED

2000-02-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991223

1999-03-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981124

1999-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IE IT