Global Patent Index - EP 0903090 A3

EP 0903090 A3 2000-05-24 - Drive for a filing tool in a brush manufacturing machine

Title (en)

Drive for a filing tool in a brush manufacturing machine

Title (de)

Antrieb für ein Stopfwerkzeug einer Bürstenherstellungs-maschine

Title (fr)

Entraînement pour un outil d'insertion d'une machine de fabrication de brosses

Publication

EP 0903090 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98117691 A

Priority

DE 29716874 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6016757A] A tufting device for the filling tool of a brush tufting machine is provided which permits the operating stroke of the filling tool to be varied and adjusted without affecting operating speed and precision of operation. The tufting device has a guide block, a guide channel in the guide block, a tuft driver tongue driven with a reciprocating movement and movably received in the guide channel, and a header having a through channel aligned with the guide channel. The header and guide block are driven with a relative reciprocating movement towards and away from each other. The device further has a drive system with a rotating drive shaft, a cam on the drive shaft and a cam follower riding on the cam. The cam follower is driven by the cam with a reciprocating movement of a predetermined stroke length. The drive system further comprises a conversion mechanism for converting the reciprocating movement of a predetermined stroke length into a drive stroke of an adjustably variable length. The relative reciprocating movement of the header and guide block and the reciprocating movement of the tuft driver tongue are both derived from the drive stroke imparting a stroke of variable length to both reciprocating movements. The tuft driver tongue and the header and guide block consistently assume a predetermined initial position irrespective of the stroke length of the reciprocating movements for taking over a tuft of fiber.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A46D 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A46D 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A46D 3/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29716874 U1 19990128; EP 0903090 A2 19990324; EP 0903090 A3 20000524; EP 0903090 B1 20030326; US 6016757 A 20000125

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130917

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-07-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59807625

- Effective date: 20140401

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120928

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120926

- Year of fee payment: 15

2004-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *GB BOUCHERIE N.V.

- Effective date: 20030930

2004-03-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031230

2003-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-24 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030326

2003-04-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59807625 P 20030430

2003-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT

2003-03-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-03-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030326

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES GB IT

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000712

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT

1999-03-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI