Global patent index - EP 0903093 A3

EP 0903093 A3 2000-04-19 - An element for seating or lying

Title (en)

An element for seating or lying

Title (de)

Liege- oder Sitzelement

Title (fr)

Element d'assise ou de couchage

Publication

EP 0903093 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98115493 A

Priority

AT 152097 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0903093A2] The slats (1) which are fixed on the longitudinal support parts and run across the longitudinal direction contain a rubber or spring elastic part (2) which is bridged by a bridging slat part (3) having no significant longitudinal extensibility. The bridging part lying parallel to the elastic part is longer than the unstressed elastic part and the extent of extension of the elastic part under strain of the slat is restricted. The length of the unstressed elastic part is only a fraction of the length (L) of the slat.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 23/18; A47C 7/22; A47C 23/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 7/22 (2006.01); A47C 7/32 (2006.01); A47C 23/18 (2006.01); A47C 23/24 (2006.01); A47C 23/26 (2006.01); A47C 23/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 7/32 (2013.01); A47C 7/22 (2013.01); A47C 23/18 (2013.01); A47C 23/24 (2013.01); A47C 23/26 (2013.01); A47C 23/28 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0903093 A2 19990324; EP 0903093 A3 20000419; AT 405013 B 19990426; AT A152097 A 19980915

INPADOC legal status

2001-08-30 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-07-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20001020

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-03-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI