Global Patent Index - EP 0903184 A3

EP 0903184 A3 2000-11-15 - Injector and its application for spraying catalyst beds

Title (en)

Injector and its application for spraying catalyst beds

Title (de)

Injektor und dessen Verwendung zum Besprühen von Katalysatorbetten

Title (fr)

Injecteur et son application à l'aspersion des lits de catalyseur

Publication

EP 0903184 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98117750 A

Priority

DE 19741752 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0903184A2] A jet injector finely distributes solid or liquid particles over a large area e.g. the use of silver with promoter as a catalytic material in the manufacture of formaldehyde. The injector has two or more single injectors secured to a base (5, 7) and a double mantled pipe (1, 2). The base (5, 7) is joined to and sealed with the double mantled pipe (1, 2) and has link apertures (70) between the inner space within the pipe (1) and the injector (8, 9, 10, 11) inner guide (11). It also has link passages (52) linking the zone between the double mantle pipe inner pipe (1) and the outer pipe (2), and an outer guide (8, 9) surrounding the inner guide (11). The base (5, 7) and individual injectors (8, 9, 10, 11) produce a mixture of carrier gas and aerosol charge of droplets or solids passing between the inner (1) and outer (2) pipes (1), and a uniform radial expansion of the mixture.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 7/06; B05B 7/08; B05B 7/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01J 23/50 (2006.01); B05B 7/06 (2006.01); B05B 7/08 (2006.01); B05B 7/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 7/1486 (2013.01); B05B 7/066 (2013.01); B05B 7/0892 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0903184 A2 19990324; EP 0903184 A3 20001115; EP 0903184 B1 20030813; CN 1096892 C 20021225; CN 1214964 A 19990428; DE 19741752 A1 19990325; ES 2205350 T3 20040501; JP H11156249 A 19990615; US 6276615 B1 20010821

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061002

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BASF A.G.

- Effective date: 20060930

2007-06-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070531

2006-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050919

2006-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060930

2006-06-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060401

2006-05-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050918

2006-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060401

2005-11-25 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20051125

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-11-09 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20051109

2005-09-19 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050919

2005-09-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050918

2005-09-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050918

2005-08-23 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050823

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-09-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040929

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-09-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040916

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-09-15 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040915

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-09-05 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040905

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-08-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040514

2004-06-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2205350 T3

2003-11-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031029

2003-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59809268 P 20030918

2003-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2003-08-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001031

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

1999-03-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI