Global Patent Index - EP 0903188 A3

EP 0903188 A3 2001-03-28 - Method and device for coiling wire-shaped rolled stock

Title (en)

Method and device for coiling wire-shaped rolled stock

Title (de)

Wickelverfahren für drahtförmiges Walzgut und hiermut korrespondierende Wickelvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de bobinage de produits laminés en forme de fil

Publication

EP 0903188 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98117588 A

Priority

DE 19741649 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0903188A2] The rolled product (1) is fed via an entry guide (7) onto a coiling drum (2) rotated at a rate such that its circumferential velocity is equal to the product feed velocity. The clamping gap (6) is opened by a clamping unit (5) for entry of the product end (4) into the gap. After this end is detected by a sensor (9), the gap is closed by the clamping unit. There is also an element (11) for adjustment of the position of the entry guide (7).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21C 47/04; B21C 47/32; B65H 65/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/22 (2006.01); B21C 47/02 (2006.01); B21C 47/06 (2006.01); B21C 47/32 (2006.01); B21C 47/34 (2006.01); B65H 65/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21C 47/34 (2013.01); B21C 47/323 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0903188 A2 19990324; EP 0903188 A3 20010328; EP 0903188 B1 20040512; AT 266484 T 20040515; DE 19741649 A1 19990325; JP H11156437 A 19990615; US 6045082 A 20000404

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070916

2007-05-22 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-04-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070403

2006-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060930

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-09-17 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060917

2006-09-16 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060916

2005-09-19 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050919

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-09-14 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050914

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-09-12 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050912

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-05-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050215

2004-06-29 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-06-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59811368 P 20040617

2004-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE IT SE

2003-06-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030425

2001-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE IT SE

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 21C 47/04 A, 7B 21C 47/32 B, 7B 65H 65/00 B

2000-05-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

1999-03-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980916

1999-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE IT SE

1999-03-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI