Global Patent Index - EP 0903199 B1

EP 0903199 B1 2002-11-27 - Improvements in and relating to workpiece gauging

Title (en)

Improvements in and relating to workpiece gauging

Title (de)

Verbesserungen an oder in Bezug auf Messen

Title (fr)

Perfectionnements relatifs au calibrage

Publication

EP 0903199 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98307304 A

Priority

  • GB 9720088 A
  • GB 9815625 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0903199A2] A gauge for a grinding machine for in-process gauging of a cylindrical off-axis region of a workpiece, in particular a crankpin (18, 20) of a crankshaft, comprises a pair of parallel struts (48, 50) each pivoted from a rigid support mounted on and movable with a wheelhead (10) which incorporates a grinding wheel (12, 14). The free ends of the struts are pivotally jointed to a plate (40), from which is pivoted a link (36) whose other end is pivotally attached to the gauge or probe (22). A pair of fingers (24, 26) incorporating transducers extend from the gauge around opposite sides of the crankpin for measuring its diameter while being ground. The strut (50) is reciprocated up and down by a servo drive (64) such that, in conjunction with the horizontal motion imparted by the wheelhead, the gauge is caused to follow substantially the same path as the workpiece region. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 5/42; B24B 49/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 5/42 (2006.01); B24B 49/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 49/04 (2013.01); B24B 5/42 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0903199 A2 19990324; EP 0903199 A3 19990714; EP 0903199 B1 20021127; DE 69809667 D1 20030109; DE 69809667 T2 20030424; ES 2189094 T3 20030701; GB 2329472 A 19990324; GB 2329472 B 20020327; GB 9819538 D0 19981028

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070909

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061002

2008-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060911

2007-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060911

2007-06-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070531

2007-04-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070403

2006-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060930

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051031

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-09-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050927

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-09-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050919

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-07-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2189094 T3

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69809667 20030109

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2001-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010320

2000-03-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR IT

1999-10-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990824

1999-07-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-07-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

1999-03-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI