Global Patent Index - EP 0903206 A3

EP 0903206 A3 2000-04-05 - Apparatus for cutting foam blocks

Title (en)

Apparatus for cutting foam blocks

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Schneiden von Schaumstoffblöcken

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la découpe de blocs de mousse

Publication

EP 0903206 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98117076 A

Priority

DE 29716725 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0903206A2] The cutting machine for cutting foam blocks has two frames in the x-y plane. Each frame has a long, tensioned cutter, which is moved back and forth along its length, driven by an eccentric. The frames (6, 7) are parallel and adjacent in the x-y plane. Each frame is connected by springs (10) to a rigid section (2) of the machine. Axes of the eccentrics (15.1, 15.2, 16.1, 16.2) are normal to motion and have equal strokes. Each is resiliently coupled to its cutting frame. Two eccentric drives are offset by 180 degrees and are rigidly coupled, forming a double eccentric.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26D 1/11

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 1/553 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 1/553 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29716725 U1 19990121; EP 0903206 A2 19990324; EP 0903206 A3 20000405

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020918

2001-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010502

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE FR LI NL

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000905

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI NL

1999-03-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI