Global Patent Index - EP 0903210 B1

EP 0903210 B1 2001-05-16 - Bar for mounting crystal for sawing and method of wire sawing wafers from crystal

Title (en)

Bar for mounting crystal for sawing and method of wire sawing wafers from crystal

Title (de)

Sägeleiste zum Fixieren eines Kristalls und Verfahren zum Abtrennen von Scheiben

Title (fr)

Barre de montage d'un cristal pour son sciage et procédé à couper le cristal en plaquettes

Publication

EP 0903210 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98116158 A

Priority

DE 19739965 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0903210A1] Rail (1), supporting the crystal while being sawn with a wire saw, has a section (3) adjacent to the crystal, the hardness of which corresponds to the hardness of the crystal. Preferably the rail is in the form of a structured composite body, the section (4) remote from the crystal being softer that the section adjacent to it.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28D 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28D 5/04 (2006.01); B24B 27/06 (2006.01); B28D 5/00 (2006.01); B28D 7/04 (2006.01); H01L 21/304 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28D 5/0082 (2013.01); Y10T 83/0405 (2015.04); Y10T 83/9292 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19739965 A1 19990318; EP 0903210 A1 19990324; EP 0903210 B1 20010516; JP 3166122 B2 20010514; JP H11151716 A 19990608; MY 116424 A 20040131; TW 407094 B 20001001; US 6035845 A 20000314

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170822

- Year of fee payment: 20

2005-08-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050827

2004-04-21 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-08-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030827

2002-08-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020821

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-05-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010801

2001-08-03 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2001-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800712 20010621

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

1999-12-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB IT

1999-05-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990412

1999-03-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980827

1999-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

1999-03-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI