Global Patent Index - EP 0903238 A3

EP 0903238 A3 2000-11-08 - Ink delivery system for ink-jet printer

Title (en)

Ink delivery system for ink-jet printer

Title (de)

Tintenzuführsystem für Tintenstrahldrucker

Title (fr)

Système d'alimentation en encre pour imprimante par jet d'encre

Publication

EP 0903238 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98306329 A

Priority

US 91483297 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0903238A2] An off-axis printing system (10) with high performance tubing. The printing system includes a media transporting system for transporting a print medium along a medium path to a print area (14), a scanning carriage (16) for holding a printing structure (18) including a printhead, and a scanning apparatus (22, 24) for scanning the carriage along a scanning axis transverse to the media path at the print area. The system further includes a fixed ink supply station (30) including an ink reservoir. A fluid conduit interconnects between the ink reservoir of the fixed ink supply station and the printing structure, the fluid conduit including a length of hollow flexible tubing routed such that a flexible loop is formed therein. The tubing includes a tubing material having an oxygen permeability characteristic of less than 100 ccmil/(100 in<2>dayatm), at 23 DEG C, 0% RH. The tubing material has a tensile modulus characteristic value which is less than 300,000 pounds per square inch (psi), and a water vapor transmission rate of less than one gmil/(100in<2>day), at 10% RH, 100 DEG F. Particular tubing materials suitable for the purpose include polyvinylidene chloride copolymer, polychlorotrifluoroethylene copolymer, and ethylenechlorotrifluoroethylene. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/175

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/175 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/17556 (2013.01); B41J 2/17509 (2013.01); B41J 2/17523 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] EP 0666178 A2 19950809 - HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]
  • [A] US 5640184 A 19970617 - MOYNIHAN EDWARD R [US], et al
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 327 (M - 0998) 13 July 1990 (1990-07-13)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 291 (C - 1067) 4 June 1993 (1993-06-04)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 004, no. 025 (M - 001) 5 March 1980 (1980-03-05)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0903238 A2 19990324; EP 0903238 A3 20001108

INPADOC legal status


2002-07-31 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20020531

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001212

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-03-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI