Global Patent Index - EP 0903257 A3

EP 0903257 A3 2000-08-30 - Torque controlling apparatus for vehicle-mounted internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Torque controlling apparatus for vehicle-mounted internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Momentregelung für eine auf einem Kraftfahrzeug montierte Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour contrôler le couple d'un moteur à combustion équipant un véhicule automobile

Publication

EP 0903257 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98117674 A

Priority

JP 25369597 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0903257A2] When an accelerator pedal (25) is suddenly stamped on, the amount of fuel injected into an engine (12) increases sharply, and the rotating force of a crankshaft (14) is increased, so that when the rotation is transmitted from the shaft (14) to an automatic transmission (23), a force which tends to twist an automobile (11) in the rotating direction of the shaft (14) is applied to the automobile (11). Consequently, the automobile (11) vibrate in the back-and-forth direction, and variations occur in the engine speed. The variations in the engine speed and the vibrations of the automobile (11) are suppressed by executing fuel-injection-amount correction corresponding to the variations in the engine speed with a predetermined phase difference and an incremental pattern with respect to the variations. As the phase difference () is thus provided, the output torque of the engine (11) which changes by lagging behind the fuel-injection-amount correction can be suitably regulated so as to suppress the variations in the engine speed. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60K 28/02; F02D 41/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60W 10/04 (2006.01); B60W 10/06 (2006.01); B60W 10/10 (2012.01); F02D 11/10 (2006.01); F02D 29/00 (2006.01); F02D 41/02 (2006.01); F02D 41/04 (2006.01); F02D 41/10 (2006.01); F02D 41/14 (2006.01); F02D 41/34 (2006.01); F02D 41/40 (2006.01); F02D 45/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/1498 (2013.01); F02D 11/105 (2013.01); F02D 41/0225 (2013.01); F02D 41/10 (2013.01); F02D 2200/1015 (2013.01); F02D 2250/21 (2013.01); F02D 2250/28 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0903257 A2 19990324; EP 0903257 A3 20000830; EP 0903257 B1 20020130; DE 69803641 D1 20020314; DE 69803641 T2 20020808; JP 3752797 B2 20060308; JP H1193733 A 19990406

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090917

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-06-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100531

2010-05-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090917

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081002

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080917

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080915

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-01-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-03-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69803641 20020314

2002-01-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010516

2001-05-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980917

1999-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-03-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI