Global Patent Index - EP 0903275 B1

EP 0903275 B1 2001-12-19 - Powered locking device of a door wing, door with such a device and railway vehicle equipped therewith

Title (en)

Powered locking device of a door wing, door with such a device and railway vehicle equipped therewith

Title (de)

Motorbetriebene Verriegelungsvorrichtung eines Türflügels, Tür mit solch einer Vorrichtung und damit ausgerüstetes Schienenfahrzeug

Title (fr)

Dispositif motorisé de verrouillage de vantail de porte, porte pourvue de ce dispositif et vehicule ferroviaire ainsi équipé

Publication

EP 0903275 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98402283 A

Priority

FR 9711764 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0903275A1] The motorized locking mechanism has a drive (6) provided by a hydraulic, pneumatic or electric motor is mounted on the wall of the vehicle above the door. The motor is coupled by a longitudinal translation mechanism (13) to the door panel (4). The door panel is locked by a locking tongue (16) attached to the motor stator (15) and steps at the ends of a longitudinal ramp (17) above the top edge of the door panel. The stator of the door drive motor tilts to engage or release the lock. Independent claims are also included for a door containing such a mechanism, and a rail vehicle having such a mechanism and/or with a door which has the mechanism.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61D 19/02; E05F 15/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61D 19/02 (2006.01); E05F 15/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61D 19/02 (2013.01); E05F 15/652 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/22 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/238 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/434 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/11 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/13 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/322 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/73 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/51 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 0903275 A1 19990324; EP 0903275 B1 20011219; AT 211088 T 20020115; DE 69803021 D1 20020131; DE 69803021 T2 20020718; FR 2768683 A1 19990326; FR 2768683 B1 19991022

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170922

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170926

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170307

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-03-07 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-03-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-02-25 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2011-02-25 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69803021 20020131

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR

2001-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 211088 T 20020115

2001-03-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010123

1999-12-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR

1999-06-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990427

1999-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR

1999-03-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI