Global Patent Index - EP 0903315 A3

EP 0903315 A3 2000-12-20 - Stairlift for persons

Title (en)

Stairlift for persons

Title (de)

Personenlift für Treppen

Title (fr)

Ascenseur d'escalier pour personne

Publication

EP 0903315 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98115433 A

Priority

DE 19740854 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0903315A2] The lift chair (5) is rotatable about its longitudinal axis (6) on an electrical rotary drive, from which it is suspended and is supported on a cantilever arm (4) moving on a column (1) having an electric rotary drive (8). The arm has a hydraulic or electrical servo-drive for longitudinal adjustment. All drives are connected to a computerized controller which operates a program adapted to provide movement between predetermined parking positions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 9/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 9/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 9/0861 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0903315 A2 19990324; EP 0903315 A3 20001220; DE 19740854 A1 19990325

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030301

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001202

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE

1999-03-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI