Global Patent Index - EP 0903376 A3

EP 0903376 A3 2000-11-02 - Moulding compositions with improved notched impact-strength comprising poly(arylene ether) and poly(arylene sulfide)

Title (en)

Moulding compositions with improved notched impact-strength comprising poly(arylene ether) and poly(arylene sulfide)

Title (de)

Polyarylenether und Polyarylensulfide enthaltende Formmassen mit verbesserter Kerbschlagzähigkeit

Title (fr)

Compositions à mouler à résistance améliorée aux chocs à partir de polyéther d'arylène et de polysulfure d'arylène

Publication

EP 0903376 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98117751 A

Priority

DE 19741467 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0903376A2] Polyarylene ethers containing carboxyl groups and impact-modified rubbers containing carboxyl-reactive functional groups are added to blends of polyarylene ethers and polyarylene sulfides. Thermoplastic moulding materials (M) comprise the following components: (A) 5-94 wt.% at least one polyarylene ether; (B) 4-93 wt.% at least one polyarylene sulphide; (C) 1-20 wt.% at least one polyarylene ether containing carboxyl groups; (D) 1-20 wt.% at least one impact-modified rubber containing functional groups which are reactive with carboxyl groups; and (E) 0-50 wt.% further additives. Independent claims are also included for (a) the preparation of (M) by blending (A)-(E), (b) the use of (M) for making fibers, films or molded articles, (c) fibers, films and molded articles comprising (M), and (d) the preparation of the fibers, films or molded articles of (M) by extrusion, blow-film extrusion or injection-moulding.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08L 71/12; C08L 71/00; C08L 81/02; C08L 81/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08J 5/18 (2006.01); B29C 45/00 (2006.01); B29C 47/00 (2006.01); C08G 65/48 (2006.01); C08L 71/00 (2006.01); C08L 71/10 (2006.01); C08L 71/12 (2006.01); C08L 81/02 (2006.01); C08L 81/06 (2006.01); D01F 6/94 (2006.01); B29K 71/00 (2006.01); B29K 81/00 (2006.01); B29L 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08L 81/06 (2013.01); C08G 65/48 (2013.01); C08L 71/00 (2013.01); C08L 81/02 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C08L 71/00 + C08L 81/00
  2. C08L 71/00 + C08L 2666/02
  3. C08L 81/02 + C08L 2666/02
  4. C08L 81/02 + C08L 2666/14
  5. C08L 81/06 + C08L 2666/14
  6. C08L 81/02 + C08L 71/00
  7. C08L 81/06 + C08L 71/00

Citation (search report)

  • [PX] EP 0855429 A1 19980729 - BASF AG [DE]
  • [DA] EP 0673973 A1 19950927 - BASF AG [DE]
  • [DA] EP 0185237 A1 19860625 - BASF AG
  • [DA] KOCH T ET AL: "FUNCTIONALIZED POLYSULFONES FROM 4,4-BIS(4-HYDROXYPHENYL)-PENTANOIC ACID, 2,2-ISOPROPYLIDENEDIPHENOL AND BIS(4-CHLOROPHENYL) SULFONE: CARBOXYLIC GROUPS. SYNTHESIS, BEHAVIOUR AND POLYMER ANALOGOUS AMIDATION OF THE", MACROMOLECULAR CHEMISTRY AND PHYSICS,DE,WILEY VCH, WEINHEIM, vol. 195, no. 5, 1 May 1994 (1994-05-01), pages 1709 - 1717, XP000440333, ISSN: 1022-1352

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0903376 A2 19990324; EP 0903376 A3 20001102; DE 19741467 A1 19990325; JP H11158376 A 19990615

INPADOC legal status


2001-11-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010402

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE DE FR GB IT NL

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001117

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 08L 71/12 A, 7C 08L 81/02 B, 7C 08L 71/00 B, 7C 08L 81/06 B

1999-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB IT NL

1999-03-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI