Global Patent Index - EP 0903393 B1

EP 0903393 B1 2001-12-05 - Charging car for charging the chambers of a coke oven battery

Title (en)

Charging car for charging the chambers of a coke oven battery

Title (de)

Kohlefüllwagen zum Befüllen von Verkokungskammern einer Koksofenbatterie

Title (fr)

Chariot pour le chargement des chambres d'une batterie de fours à coke

Publication

EP 0903393 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98115886 A

Priority

  • DE 19741875 A
  • DE 19743868 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0903393A2] Coal wagon for filling coking chambers of a coke oven battery has horizontally moving screw conveyor housing under the bottom outlet of the wagon. The housing (5) of the screw conveyor (2) is horizontally movable below the bottom outlet (1) of the coal wagon. It is provided with a positioning drive (11) which moves it between two positions. In the exit position the outlet connection (6) of the housing is offset from the filling hole (10) of the coking chamber, while in the filling position it is substantially aligned with the filling hole. The conveyor housing (5) is provided with a top cover plate (17) which in the exit position of the conveyor closes the wagon outlet (1) so that no coal is spilled on the covering of the coking chambers. The outlet connection is provided with a blocking element (18) which operable by means of a cylinder unit (19) attached to the conveyor. The telescopic pipe (9) is operated by a mechanism (20) attached to the circumference of the outlet connection (6). The conveyor housing is movable on rails (12). The lid lifting mechanism (3) is movable along rails (14) running parallel to the rails (12). The steel substructure of the wagon carries a hydraulic or an electromechanical for positioning the conveyor housing and the lid lifting mechanism. A vertically movable mechanism at the end of the conveyor housing serves for cleaning the filling hole frame and its lid.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10B 31/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10B 31/04 (2006.01); F27D 3/00 (2006.01); F27D 3/06 (2006.01); F27D 3/08 (2006.01); F27D 21/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10B 25/24 (2013.01); C10B 31/04 (2013.01); F27D 3/00 (2013.01); F27D 3/06 (2013.01); F27D 3/08 (2013.01); F27D 2021/023 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0903393 A2 19990324; EP 0903393 A3 19990818; EP 0903393 B1 20011205; BR 9803970 A 19991221; BR 9803970 B1 20110419; CA 2245380 A1 19990323; CA 2245380 C 20051115; PT 903393 E 20020531; US 6099229 A 20000808; US 6152668 A 20001128

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160822

2017-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160822

2017-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160831

2017-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170301

2017-05-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170428

2017-04-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160822

2017-03-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59802309

2016-12-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160831

2016-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150823

2016-05-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160222

2016-03-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2016-03-01 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20160222

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150824

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150820

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150819

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: THYSSENKRUPP INDUSTRIAL SOLUTIONS AG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: THYSSENKRUPP UHDE GMBH, 44141 DORTMUND, DE

- Document: DE 59802309

2015-11-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59802309

- Representative's name: ALBRECHT, RAINER, DIPL.-ING. DR.-ING., DE

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150819

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150821

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-12-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20140224

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-11-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20140820

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-08-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: THYSSENKRUPP UHDE GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: UHDE GMBH, 44141 DORTMUND, DE

- Document: DE 59802309

- Effective date: 20120627

2012-08-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: THYSSENKRUPP INDUSTRIAL SOLUTIONS AG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: UHDE GMBH, 44141 DORTMUND, DE

- Document: DE 59802309

- Effective date: 20120627

2012-08-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59802309

- Representative's name: ALBRECHT, RAINER, DIPL.-ING. DR.-ING., DE

- Effective date: 20120627

2012-06-27 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59802309

- Representative's name: RAINER ALBRECHT, DE

2006-07-14 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2006-06-30 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: UHDE GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20060502

2006-03-29 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020227

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802309 20020117

2002-01-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011207

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT PT SE

2000-07-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THYSSEN KRUPP ENCOKE GMBH

2000-05-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000331

2000-04-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR GB IT PT SE

1999-11-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990904

1999-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-08-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT PT SE

1999-03-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI