Global patent index - EP 0903398 A3

EP 0903398 A3 2000-02-02 - Lubricating grease containing alkoxylated amine corrosion inhibitor

Title (en)

Lubricating grease containing alkoxylated amine corrosion inhibitor

Title (de)

Schmierfett enthaltend ein alkoxyliertes Amin als Korrosionsinhibitor

Title (fr)

Graisse lubrifiante contenant une amine alcoxylée comme inhibiteur de corrosion

Publication

EP 0903398 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98117874 A

Priority

US 93603697 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0903398A2] The invention relates to a lubricating grease having enhanced corrosion-resistance by means of a corrosion-inhibiting additive comprising one or more defined alkoxylated amines.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 133/08; C10M 169/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10M 133/08 (2006.01); C10M 149/12 (2006.01); C10M 169/04 (2006.01); C10M 169/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 149/12 (2013.01); C10M 133/08 (2013.01); C10M 169/044 (2013.01); C10M 169/06 (2013.01); C10M 2207/022 (2013.01); C10M 2207/026 (2013.01); C10M 2207/123 (2013.01); C10M 2207/125 (2013.01); C10M 2207/129 (2013.01); C10M 2207/144 (2013.01); C10M 2207/146 (2013.01); C10M 2207/22 (2013.01); C10M 2207/281 (2013.01); C10M 2207/282 (2013.01); C10M 2207/283 (2013.01); C10M 2207/286 (2013.01); C10M 2215/042 (2013.01); C10M 2215/064 (2013.01); C10M 2215/065 (2013.01); C10M 2215/22 (2013.01); C10M 2215/221 (2013.01); C10M 2215/222 (2013.01); C10M 2215/225 (2013.01); C10M 2215/226 (2013.01); C10M 2215/30 (2013.01); C10M 2217/044 (2013.01); C10M 2217/045 (2013.01); C10M 2219/082 (2013.01); C10M 2219/086 (2013.01); C10M 2219/087 (2013.01); C10M 2219/089 (2013.01); C10M 2219/10 (2013.01); C10M 2219/102 (2013.01); C10M 2219/104 (2013.01); C10M 2219/106 (2013.01); C10M 2219/108 (2013.01); C10M 2223/04 (2013.01); C10M 2223/042 (2013.01); C10N 2210/01 (2013.01); C10N 2230/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0903398 A2 19990324; EP 0903398 A3 20000202; CA 2243113 A1 19990323

INPADOC legal status

2003-11-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030401

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB NL

2000-09-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EXXONMOBIL RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000706

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

1999-03-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI