EP 0903421 A1 19990324 - Ferritic heat-resistant steel and method for producing it
Title (en)
Ferritic heat-resistant steel and method for producing it
Title (de)
Ferritischer,wärmebeständiger Stahl und Verfahren zur Herstellung
Title (fr)
Acier ferritique réfractaire et procédé de fabrication
Publication
Application
Priority
- JP 25647997 A 19970922
- JP 25648097 A 19970922
- JP 25648197 A 19970922
Abstract (en)
The invention provides a ferritic heat-resistant steel having excellent high-temperature oxidation resistance, especially excellent steam oxidation-resistant characteristics. In high-Cr ferritic heat-resistant steel, ultra-fine oxide particles having a size of not larger than 1 mu m are formed just below the oxide films and formed on the steel base, whereby the adhesiveness between the films and the base is enhanced. The ferretic heat-resistant steel consists of: C from 0.02 to 0.18% Si up to 1.0%, Mn up to 1.5%, P up to 0.030%, S up to 0.015% Cr from 8.0 to 13.0% Mo up to 2%, W up to 4%, with W + 2Mo ≤4% V from 0.10 to 0.50%, Nb from 0.02 to 0.14% either Ti and/or Y, with 0.01 ≤Ti + Y ≤0.30% either Rh and/or Ir, with 0.3% ≤Rh + (1/2)Ir ≤5% either Pd and/or Pt in a total amount between 0.3 and 5% balance Fe
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
C21D 1/18 (2006.01); C21D 8/00 (2006.01); C22C 38/00 (2006.01); C22C 38/22 (2006.01); C22C 38/24 (2006.01); C22C 38/26 (2006.01); C21D 1/28 (2006.01); C21D 8/02 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
C21D 1/18 (2013.01 - EP US); C21D 6/002 (2013.01 - EP US); C21D 8/005 (2013.01 - EP US); C22C 38/002 (2013.01 - EP US); C22C 38/005 (2013.01 - EP US); C22C 38/04 (2013.01 - EP US); C22C 38/22 (2013.01 - EP US); C22C 38/24 (2013.01 - EP US); C22C 38/26 (2013.01 - EP US); C22C 38/28 (2013.01 - EP US); F28F 19/06 (2013.01 - EP US); C21D 1/28 (2013.01 - EP US); C21D 8/0205 (2013.01 - EP US); C21D 2211/005 (2013.01 - EP US)
Citation (search report)
- [X] DE 3130179 A1 19820318 - NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]
- [X] EP 0384433 A1 19900829 - HITACHI METALS LTD [JP]
- [A] EP 0199046 A1 19861029 - NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]
- [A] DE 2042394 A1 19710325 - NIPPON KOKAN KK
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 15, no. 197 (C - 0833) 21 May 1991 (1991-05-21)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 18, no. 251 (C - 1199) 13 May 1994 (1994-05-13)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 208 (C - 596) 16 May 1989 (1989-05-16)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 17, no. 216 (C - 1053) 28 April 1993 (1993-04-28)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
BE DE
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 0903421 A1 19990324; EP 0903421 B1 20041124; DE 69827729 D1 20041230; DE 69827729 T2 20050428; DE 69829012 D1 20050317; DE 69829012 T2 20050707; DE 69837055 D1 20070322; DE 69837055 T2 20071108; EP 1329531 A2 20030723; EP 1329531 A3 20030730; EP 1329531 B1 20070207; EP 1329531 B8 20070919; EP 1329532 A2 20030723; EP 1329532 A3 20030730; EP 1329532 B1 20050209; EP 1329532 B8 20070919; US 2002011285 A1 20020131; US 2003127163 A1 20030710; US 2004060621 A1 20040401; US 2006054253 A1 20060316
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 98307629 A 19980921; DE 69827729 T 19980921; DE 69829012 T 19980921; DE 69837055 T 19980921; EP 03007332 A 19980921; EP 03007333 A 19980921; US 15739298 A 19980921; US 19903102 A 20020722; US 25049205 A 20051017; US 67387903 A 20030930