Global patent index - EP 0903430 A3

EP 0903430 A3 2000-05-10 - Spinning method and machine with condenser

Title (en)

Spinning method and machine with condenser

Title (de)

Spinnverfahren und Spinnmaschine mit Kondensiervorrichtung

Title (fr)

Procédé et machine de filature avec condenseur

Publication

EP 0903430 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98810857 A

Priority

CH 224197 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0903430A2] A ring spinning drafting system (1) is followed by a perforated condensing roller (10) equipped with internal suction. A nip roller (13) acts a twist-stop for the twist traveling back from the spindle (3). The yarn (2) leaves at the nip line (K) so that it is not deflected any further by the condensing roller (10). The angle (F) between the yarn (2) and the line (N) joining the centers of the rollers (10,13) is greater or equal to 90 degrees . An Independent claim is also included for a spinning process, especially using a ring spindle as the twisting device, where the sliver is twisted without being supported by the condensing surface but only by the twist stop (13).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 5/72

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 1/02 (2006.01); D01H 5/72 (2006.01); D01H 5/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 5/72 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0903430 A2 19990324; EP 0903430 A3 20000510; EP 0903430 B1 20030409; AT 237012 T 20030415; DE 59807821 D1 20030515

INPADOC legal status

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2007-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070301

2006-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-08-12 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050812

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-03-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040112

2003-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE IT

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020228

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE IT

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000708

2000-05-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7D 01H 5/72 A, 7D 01H 1/02 B

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE IT

1999-03-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI