Global Patent Index - EP 0903437 A3

EP 0903437 A3 2000-04-05 - Process for reducing the adhesion between a wet fibrous web and a rotating roller

Title (en)

Process for reducing the adhesion between a wet fibrous web and a rotating roller

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Verringerung der Haftung einer feuchten Faserstoffbahn an einer routierenden Walze

Title (fr)

Procédé pour diminuer l'adhésion entre une bande fibreuse humide et un rouleau rotatif

Publication

EP 0903437 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98112932 A

Priority

DE 19741517 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0903437A2] A steam cushion is formed between a fiber web (1) and a rotating roller (4). The roller (4) is heated to temperature higher than that required to dry the web (1) or for extracting water from it, giving a roller surface temp. of 120 degrees C. Steam is blown into the entry gap between the roller (4) and the web (1), the web (1) temp. being 70 degrees C and having a dry matter content of 60 %.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 3/02; D21F 5/02; D21F 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/02 (2006.01); D21F 5/02 (2006.01); F26B 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 5/02 (2013.01); D21F 3/02 (2013.01); D21F 3/0272 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0903437 A2 19990324; EP 0903437 A3 20000405; DE 19741517 A1 19990325; US 2001007279 A1 20010712; US 6436239 B2 20020820

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030116

2003-03-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020905

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FI IT SE

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001005

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7D 21F 3/02 A, 7D 21F 5/02 B, 7D 21F 5/04 B

1999-12-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH SULZER PAPIERTECHNIK PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI IT SE

1999-03-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI