Global Patent Index - EP 0903441 B1

EP 0903441 B1 2003-06-18 - Apparatus for placing an additive

Title (en)

Apparatus for placing an additive

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Einbringen von Zusatzmaterial

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour introduire un matériau additif

Publication

EP 0903441 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98117622 A

Priority

DE 29716935 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0903441A2] The arrangement is in the form of a transfer vibrator (13) with a transfer pipe (28). A hopper (27) with charging opening (30) is connected at the bottom area, to a vertical transfer pipe with a lower outlet (33). The vibrator mechanism (29) is housed in the bottom part of the pipe. Inside the pipe, a loosening rod (36) moves periodically in the lengthwise direction. The rod may extend from the hopper to the top end of the vibrator mechanism, and protruding transverse spikes (37) or hooks can be mounted on it. It can be actuated directly by a double-acting ram (35) or by a rotary crankshaft. Its bottom end can work in a lengthwise guide (38).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02D 3/12; E02D 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02D 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02D 3/08 (2013.01); E02D 3/123 (2013.01); E02D 7/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29716935 U1 19980212; AT 243285 T 20030715; EP 0903441 A2 19990324; EP 0903441 A3 19990506; EP 0903441 B1 20030618

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *KELLER GRUNDBAU G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20050930

2006-07-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050917

2006-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060401

2005-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050917

2005-09-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050917

2005-09-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050917

2004-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041130

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-09-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040928

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-09-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040923

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-09-22 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040922

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-09-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040917

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-06-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040319

2004-04-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-09-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-07-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59808740 P 20030724

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB IT

2003-06-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SCHILLER, KONRAD DIPL.-ING.,

2001-11-07 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: APPARATUS FOR PLACING AN ADDITIVE

2001-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010702

2000-01-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE DE FR GB IT

1999-11-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990917

1999-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-05-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB IT

1999-03-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI