Global Patent Index - EP 0903448 A3

EP 0903448 A3 2000-10-11 - Roofing membrane

Title (en)

Roofing membrane

Title (de)

Dachbahn

Title (fr)

Membrane de toiture

Publication

EP 0903448 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98116387 A

Priority

DE 29716901 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0903448A2] The roofing insulation material has an adhesive layer (32) integrated into its upper surface (31) which can be activated by heat or moisture. The adhesive secures the insulation in place. The insulation can be a film of polyethylene (PE) or polyvinyl chloride (PVC).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 12/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06N 7/00 (2006.01); E04D 12/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 12/002 (2013.01); D06N 5/00 (2013.01); D06N 2203/042 (2013.01); D06N 2203/048 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29716901 U1 19971113; EP 0903448 A2 19990324; EP 0903448 A3 20001011; NO 984361 A 19990322; NO 984361 D0 19980918

INPADOC legal status


2002-02-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010412

2001-08-02 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HAUSPROFI BAUSYSTEME GMBH

1999-11-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHUERMANN, WOLFRAM

1999-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-03-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI