Global Patent Index - EP 0903452 B1

EP 0903452 B1 2000-03-08 - Improved connecting device for posts and panels

Title (en)

Improved connecting device for posts and panels

Title (de)

Verbesserte Verbindungseinrichtung von Pfosten und Paneelen

Title (fr)

Dispositif perfectionné d'assemblage de poteaux et de panneaux

Publication

EP 0903452 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98450003 A

Priority

FR 9711918 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0903452A1] The fence is made from solid metal posts (1) e.g. of aluminum or extruded aluminum alloy, each with two lateral recesses (2) to receive the edges of metal mesh fencing panels (5) made from vertical (6) and horizontal rods. The vertical end rods of each panel have corrugations (8) shaped to fit in the post recesses to hold the panels in place. The tip (8a) of each corrugation in a vertical end rod is designed to engage with a groove (11) in the inner surface of the post's flange (10). Each post also has a curved inner surface on its rear flange (4) to facilitate assembly.

Abstract (fr)

L'objet de l'invention est un dispositif d'assemblage de poteaux et panneaux comprenant des panneaux (5) du type en treillis soudés dont les bords destinés à être assemblés aux poteaux sont définis par des fils de chaîne à profil à ondulations (6) et des poteaux (1) munis sur au moins une de leur face latérale d'une rigole (2) de largeur correspondant sensiblement à celle dudit profil à ondulations, caractérisé en ce que les fils de chaîne de bordure (6) desdits panneaux (5) sont reçus et immobilisés dans lesdites rigoles (2) par insertion en force et blocage des sommets (8a) des ondulations (8) desdits fils de chaîne dans une gorge (11) ménagée sur l'une des faces internes (10) desdites rigoles. Application notamment aux clôtures métalliques. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 17/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04H 17/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 17/161 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0903452 A1 19990324; EP 0903452 B1 20000308; AT 190376 T 20000315; DE 69800090 D1 20000413; DE 69800090 T2 20001102; ES 2146126 T3 20000716; FR 2768760 A1 19990326; FR 2768760 B1 19991217

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160331

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160418

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160413

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160429

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160331

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160331

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160331

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-03-31 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150324

- Year of fee payment: 18

2002-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2002-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020331

2002-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020331

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-02-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-02-07 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2000-08-18 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2000-08-18 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2000-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2146126

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-06-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000607

2000-06-08 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000608

2000-06-07 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO INGG. FISCHETTI & WEBER

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-05-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: FRENCH

2000-04-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69800090

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-13

2000-03-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000330

2000-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-03-08 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000308

2000-03-08 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000308

2000-03-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 190376

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-03-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: AUGER, MARC

2000-03-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: LIPPI, BERNARD

2000-03-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: LIPPI, JACQUES

1999-12-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

1999-03-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980423

1999-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

1999-03-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI