Global Patent Index - EP 0903457 B1

EP 0903457 B1 2002-11-20 - Electric lock for a vehicle door

Title (en)

Electric lock for a vehicle door

Title (de)

Elektrisches Schloss für Kraftfahrzeugtür

Title (fr)

Serrure électrique pour portière de véhicule

Publication

EP 0903457 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98402201 A

Priority

FR 9711680 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0903457A1] Two motors (22,31) use worm and pinion drives (23,26.32) to move a bolt pawl (5,7) operating rod and plate (12,20) in orthogonal directions either separately or together. The position of the plate may prevent either external (13) or internal (15) lock opening or both. The operating rod (12) is connected to the pawl through a ball and socket joint (21), intermediate rotating element and pin (11).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/32; E05B 47/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/12 (2006.01); E05B 65/20 (2006.01); E05B 13/00 (2006.01); E05B 47/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 81/14 (2013.01); E05B 77/26 (2013.01); E05B 77/28 (2013.01); E05B 81/20 (2013.01); E05B 81/66 (2013.01); E05B 83/36 (2013.01); Y10S 292/23 (2013.01); Y10S 292/27 (2013.01); Y10T 292/1047 (2015.04); Y10T 292/1082 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0903457 A1 19990324; EP 0903457 B1 20021120; BR 9803166 A 20000111; DE 69809519 D1 20030102; DE 69809519 T2 20030925; ES 2186987 T3 20030516; FR 2768764 A1 19990326; FR 2768764 B1 19991126; US 6003910 A 19991221

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090908

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110705

2011-07-15 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110715

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090907

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090907

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-05-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090907

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080911

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080822

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080919

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080922

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2186987 T3

2003-03-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030219

2003-02-20 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030220

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69809519 20030102

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT SE

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020326

1999-12-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT SE

1999-08-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990601

1999-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT SE

1999-03-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI