Global Patent Index - EP 0903471 B1

EP 0903471 B1 2001-12-05 - Device for variable camshaft timing in an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Device for variable camshaft timing in an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur verstellung der nockenwelle einer brennkraftmaschine mit innerer verbrennung

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour varier le calage d'un arbre à cames de moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 0903471 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98890262 A

Priority

  • AT 158697 A
  • AT 135898 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0903471A1] The adjusting mechanism for the camshaft has a planetary gear with a high gear reduction ratio, preferably more than 1:8 and especially more than 1:12. The gear is self-locking relative to adjustment of the camshaft (1) by the drive pulley (36). The mechanism is operated by an electric motor, and the motor and an internally toothed gear (35) are fastened to the drive pulley. The sun wheel (37) is fastened to the camshaft.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 1/352

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/344 (2006.01); F01L 1/352 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/34406 (2013.01); F01L 1/352 (2013.01); F01L 2820/032 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0903471 A1 19990324; EP 0903471 B1 20011205; AT 210243 T 20011215; DE 59802310 D1 20020117; ES 2167864 T3 20020516; US 6138622 A 20001031

INPADOC legal status


2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-07-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59802310

- Effective date: 20110401

2010-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090910

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090924

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070910

2009-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070911

2008-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070911

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070910

2008-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080923

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071001

2008-09-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080531

2008-05-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070910

2006-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060930

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-09-21 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060921

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-08-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060828

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2167864 T3

2002-02-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802310 20020117

2002-01-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011205

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2001-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210243 T 20011215

2000-09-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000720

1999-12-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES FR GB IT

1999-09-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990706

1999-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

1999-03-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI