Global Patent Index - EP 0903535 A3

EP 0903535 A3 2000-09-20 - Louvre system for lamps

Title (en)

Louvre system for lamps

Title (de)

Lamellenanordnung für Leuchten

Title (fr)

Système de grille pour luminaires

Publication

EP 0903535 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98250339 A

Priority

DE 29716999 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0903535A2] Prismatic lamellas (2) are formed from transparent material which is virtually parabolically convex or virtually cylindrically convex or triangular. On their upper edges pointing towards the light device (3) they run pointedly and on their under sides (6) are convex. The device on the undersides is concave and mirrored, straight, straight and mirrored, convex, convex and mirrored, prismatic in a longitudinal direction, or prismatic in a cross-direction. The prismatic lamellas are formed as hollow chamber extrusions with hollow chambers in inverted form, which have a radiation path similar to that of a customary parabolic mirror screen.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 11/02; F21V 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 5/02 (2006.01); F21V 7/00 (2006.01); F21V 11/02 (2006.01); F21V 13/04 (2006.01); F21V 13/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 11/02 (2013.01); F21V 5/02 (2013.01); F21V 7/00 (2013.01); F21V 13/04 (2013.01); F21V 13/10 (2013.01); F21Y 2103/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29716999 U1 19980108; EP 0903535 A2 19990324; EP 0903535 A3 20000920

INPADOC legal status


2002-02-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010321

2001-07-12 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-06-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 21V 11/02 A, 7F 21V 5/02 B

1999-06-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SEMPERLUX AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, LICHTTECHNISCHE WERK

1999-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-03-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI