Global Patent Index - EP 0903541 A3

EP 0903541 A3 2001-04-18 - Glow plug

Title (en)

Glow plug

Title (de)

Glühkerze

Title (fr)

Bougie à incandescence

Publication

EP 0903541 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98117773 A

Priority

  • JP 27355397 A
  • JP 27355197 A
  • JP 27355297 A
  • JP 27355497 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0903541A2] An improved sealing structure of a glow plug for diesel engines is provided. The glow plug includes a heater assembly which consists of a heater casing, a heating element, and a power supply rod. The heater casing has disposed therein the heating element connecting with the power supply rod and also has formed on a periphery thereof a press fit wall press-fitted into a hollow housing in tight engagement with an inner peripheral wall of the hollow housing. An uneven surface is formed on one of the press fit wall of the heater casing and the inner peripheral wall of the hollow housing. The uneven surface is patterned with lines such as fine grooves or ridges oriented at an angle relative to a longitudinal center line of the glow plug for forming barriers when the press fit wall is forced into the hollow housing which establish airtight seals between the heater casing and the hollow housing. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23Q 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23Q 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23Q 7/001 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] WO 8301093 A1 19830331 - BAILEY JOHN M
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 007, no. 071 (M - 202) 24 March 1983 (1983-03-24)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0903541 A2 19990324; EP 0903541 A3 20010418; EP 0903541 B1 20041117; DE 69827571 D1 20041223; DE 69827571 T2 20060105; EP 1441179 A2 20040728; EP 1441179 A3 20110518

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170928

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121001

2013-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120918

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120918

2013-06-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130531

2013-05-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120918

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110920

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110914

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110922

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-11-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050818

2005-08-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-12-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69827571 P 20041223

2004-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-11-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031113

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010508

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-03-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI