Global Patent Index - EP 0903542 A3

EP 0903542 A3 2000-03-01 - Damper device, in particular for gas cooker ignition system

Title (en)

Damper device, in particular for gas cooker ignition system

Title (de)

Dämpfungsvorrichtung, insbesondere für eine Zündschaltvorrichtung für Gasherde

Title (fr)

Dispositif amortisseur, en particulier pour dispositif d'allumage d'une cuisinière à gaz

Publication

EP 0903542 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98111376 A

Priority

DE 29717015 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0903542A2] The driver slide-piece (12) runs along a fixed guide (16) and supports a deformable body in the form of an elastic O-ring placed over a preferably triangular-sectioned pin on the driver slide-piece. The guide has surfaces fitting into the movement path of the deformable body. During the return movement of the driver slide piece, the surfaces exert a preset frictional force adapted to its spring properties onto the elastic body. The surfaces act laterally on the O-ring and deform its annular shape.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 3/103 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29717015 U1 19971120; EP 0903542 A2 19990324; EP 0903542 A3 20000301

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030123

2002-08-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020712

2001-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSPARKS S.P.A.

2000-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000129

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-03-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI