Global Patent Index - EP 0903664 A3

EP 0903664 A3 2000-02-02 - Floating-point processor with operand-format precision greater than execution precision

Title (en)

Floating-point processor with operand-format precision greater than execution precision

Title (de)

Gleitkommaprozessor mit einer Operandenformatgenauigkeit grösser als die Ausführungsgenauigkeit

Title (fr)

Processeur à virgule flottante ayant une précision de format d'opérande supérieure à la précision d'exécution

Publication

EP 0903664 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98117383 A

Priority

US 93444997 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0903664A2] A floating-point processor (AP1) nominally capable of single and double, but not extended, precision execution stores operands in extended-precision format. A format converter (FMT) converts single and double precision source values to extended-precision format. Trap logic (TPL) checks the apparent precision of the extended-precision operands and the requested result precision to determine whether the floating-point processor (AP1) can execute the requested operation and yield the appropriate result. If the maximum of the requested precision and the maximum apparent precision of the operands is single or double, the requested operation is executed in hardware (EXU). Otherwise, a trap is issued to call an extended precision floating-point subroutine (SUB). This approach augments the class of operations that can be handled in hardware by a double-precision floating-point processor (AP1), and thus improves the floating-point computational throughput of an incorporating computer system. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 7/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 7/57 (2006.01); G06F 9/30 (2006.01); G06F 9/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 7/483 (2013.01); G06F 9/3013 (2013.01); G06F 9/3861 (2013.01); G06F 9/3877 (2013.01); G06F 7/49942 (2013.01); G06F 2207/382 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [YD] WO 9531767 A1 19951123 - VLSI TECHNOLOGY INC [US]
  • [A] US 5630160 A 19970513 - SIMPSON RICHARD [GB], et al
  • [Y] DARLEY M ET AL: "THE TMS390C602A FLOATING-POINT COPROCESSOR FOR SPARC SYSTEMS", IEEE MICRO, vol. 10, no. 3, June 1990 (1990-06-01), pages 36-46, XP000179277, ISSN: 0272-1732

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0903664 A2 19990324; EP 0903664 A3 20000202; US 6029243 A 20000222

INPADOC legal status


2006-07-19 [R18R] APPLICATION REFUSED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20060610

2006-07-12 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20031012

2002-08-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2002-05-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020412

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-06-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000410

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-03-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI