Global Patent Index - EP 0903706 A3

EP 0903706 A3 2001-05-16 - Electronic cash register

Title (en)

Electronic cash register

Title (de)

Elektronische Registrierkasse

Title (fr)

Caisse enregistreuse électronique

Publication

EP 0903706 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98117835 A

Priority

JP 25664597 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0903706A2] An object of the invention is to provide an electronic cash register capable registering sales data speedy while keeping optimum operability. To this end, the electronic cash can change and setup a commodity to be assigned to a registration key even during a sales registering processing without stopping serving customers, as well as register sales data of any commodity whose code is changed using a registration key after the changing and setting. Another object of the invention is to provide an electronic cash register with improved operability, which can change the assignment according to sales quantity and sales time. Upon an input from a commodity key (5b), sales data of a commodity having a commodity code related to the commodity key (5b) by a key layout memory (3-1) is registered. The registered sales information of each commodity can be printed out or displayed. If it is designated that a specific commodity is set so that its code is related to the commodity key during the sales registering processing, the commodity code related to the commodity key is replaced by the specific commodity code. After this registration, the sales of the specific commodity is registered according to the commodity key input. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07G 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 3/023 (2006.01); G07G 1/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07G 1/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XA] EP 0720134 A2 19960703 - SHARP KK [JP]
  • [XD] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 621 (P - 1645) 16 November 1993 (1993-11-16)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 078 (P - 1488) 16 February 1993 (1993-02-16)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 658 (P - 1654) 6 December 1993 (1993-12-06)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0903706 A2 19990324; EP 0903706 A3 20010516; JP 3326370 B2 20020924; JP H1195901 A 19990409

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080403

2007-12-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071122

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB

2001-11-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010912

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE GB

1999-03-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI