Global Patent Index - EP 0903711 A3

EP 0903711 A3 2000-08-23 - Method for transmitting traffic information

Title (en)

Method for transmitting traffic information

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Ermittlung von Verkehrsinformationen

Title (fr)

Procédé de transmission d'information sur le trafic

Publication

EP 0903711 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98117283 A

Priority

DE 19741229 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0903711A2] Traffic information is related to stretches of road, in particular motorways. By means of positional fixed detectors, local detection cross-sections are formed, traffic related measurement values are determined and are pre-processed by means of a local computer, and normalised on a specified data protocol, aggregated and transmitted by wireless communication to a supervisory data processing installation. The transmitted data is processed in one computation procedure for determining traffic information, the input data of which vehicle speed (v) and vehicle density (q). The speed of traffic and traffic density (k) at one detection cross- section, can be used as the output data. The data can be subsequently further processed in one complex, expanded processing procedure for determining traffic information related to stretches of roads and motorways.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08G 1/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/01 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/0104 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0903711 A2 19990324; EP 0903711 A3 20000823

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040423

2003-11-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031013

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010219

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-03-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI