Global patent index - EP 0903713 A3

EP 0903713 A3 2000-05-03 - Circuit breaker with two supply current paths for two traffic signalling devices

Title (en)

Circuit breaker with two supply current paths for two traffic signalling devices

Title (de)

Lastschalter mit zwei Speisestromwegen für zwei Verkehrssignalvorrichtungen

Title (fr)

Disjoncteur à deux voies de courant d'alimentation pour deux dispositifs de signalisation routière

Publication

EP 0903713 A3 (FR)

Application

EP 98402236 A

Priority

FR 9711688 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0903713A2] The two-way control switch is fitted at the output of an existing traffic lamp controller (20) supplied from a voltage source (30). The control switch has a current level detector (4) in the cable (2) supplying the principal lamp (22). The current detector controls a switch (6) connected in series with a parallel branch cable (3) supplying a second lamp (23), opening the switch when the principal current is present.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08G 1/097; H05B 37/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/097 (2006.01); H05B 37/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/097 (2013.01); H05B 37/032 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[A] FR 1280049 A 19611229

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0903713 A2 19990324; EP 0903713 A3 20000503; FR 2768832 A1 19990326; FR 2768832 B1 19991126

INPADOC legal status

2001-08-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20001103

2001-02-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-03-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI