Global Patent Index - EP 0903716 A3

EP 0903716 A3 2000-04-12 - Marking sign support

Title (en)

Marking sign support

Title (de)

Markierschildträger

Title (fr)

Support pour plaque de marquage

Publication

EP 0903716 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98112516 A

Priority

DE 19738878 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0903716A2] The flat, rectangular, fold-out holder housing (1) consists of a bottom part (2) containing the marking label, and a transparent top part (3) linked to it along a side edge (5). A fixture element on the housing consists of a first perforated fixture tab (18) molded on the free lengthwise side edge (14) of the top housing part, and a second perforated fixture tab molded on the link-side lengthwise side edge of the bottom housing part.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 3/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19738878 A1 19990311; EP 0903716 A2 19990324; EP 0903716 A3 20000412

INPADOC legal status


2001-07-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20001013

2001-01-25 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-03-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI