Global Patent Index - EP 0903765 B1

EP 0903765 B1 2002-11-13 - A circuit breaker

Title (en)

A circuit breaker

Title (de)

Schutzschalter

Title (fr)

Disjoncteur

Publication

EP 0903765 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98307415 A

Priority

ZA 9708466 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0903765A2] A circuit breaker 10 includes a primary housing 12 containing an operating mechanism 14, the operating mechanism 14 including a plurality of output conductors 16. An earth leakage sensing device comprising an oval-shaped core 20 is mounted in the primary housing 12. Electrically conductive elements 22 are mounted on the output conductors 16 and project through an oval-shaped opening defined by the core 20. Current sensing circuitry and earth leakage sensing circuitry are incorporated in a secondary housing 42, the secondary housing 42 being received within the primary housing 12. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 83/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 83/02 (2006.01); H01H 83/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 83/144 (2013.01); H01H 2083/148 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0903765 A2 19990324; EP 0903765 A3 19991117; EP 0903765 B1 20021113; AT 227883 T 20021115; DE 69809359 D1 20021219; DE 69809359 T2 20030904; JP H11185593 A 19990709

INPADOC legal status


2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100915

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100914

2011-08-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100914

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-07-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69809359

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-06-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100914

2011-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100914

2011-05-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-04-13 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110401

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091012

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090915

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090910

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090911

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090909

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090903

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090910

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-07-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69809359 20021219

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT NL SE

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-11-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 227883 T 20021115

2002-05-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020328

2000-07-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR GB IT NL SE

2000-01-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991124

1999-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-11-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT NL SE

1999-03-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI