Global Patent Index - EP 0903800 A3

EP 0903800 A3 2000-04-19 - High-frequency component

Title (en)

High-frequency component

Title (de)

Hochfrequenz-Bauelement

Title (fr)

Composant haute fréquence

Publication

EP 0903800 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98117767 A

Priority

JP 25530397 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0903800A2] A high-frequency component is provided that can easily realize a higher characterisitic impedance of a transmission line which constitutes an inductance element, that can be formed into a smaller size, and that has excellent frequency characteristics. In the high-frequency component, a high-pass filter (F1) formed of a transmission line (L1) and three capacitors (C1 - C3) is connected between a first port (P1) and a second port P2), and a low-pass filter (F2) formed of another transmission line (L2), which is an inductance element, and two capacitors (C4, C5), which are capacitance elements, is connected between the first port (P1) and the third port (P3). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01P 1/12; H01P 1/213

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H03H 7/01 (2006.01); H01P 1/12 (2006.01); H01P 1/213 (2006.01); H03H 7/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/127 (2013.01); H01P 1/2135 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] EP 0793289 A1 19970903 - HITACHI METALS LTD [JP]
  • [A] US 5404118 A 19950404 - OKAMURA HISATAKE [JP], et al
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 18, no. 38 (E - 1495) 20 January 1994 (1994-01-20)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 18, no. 340 (E - 1569) 27 June 1994 (1994-06-27)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0903800 A2 19990324; EP 0903800 A3 20000419; JP H1197962 A 19990409

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-10 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060322

2003-10-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030821

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FI FR GB SE

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01P 1/12 A, 7H 01P 1/213 B

1999-03-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980918

1999-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB SE

1999-03-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI