Global Patent Index - EP 0903809 A3

EP 0903809 A3 2001-04-18 - Anchoring device and connecting device using it

Title (en)

Anchoring device and connecting device using it

Title (de)

Abfangeinrichtung und Anschlusseinrichtung unter Verwendung der Abfangeinrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de retenue et dispositif de connexion l'utilisant

Publication

EP 0903809 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98115372 A

Priority

DE 19741215 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0903809A2] The clamping device includes an electrically conducting clamp housing which has inward extending claws for contacting the screen of the cable. The clamp housing (2,112) has an end wall (12,114) with a recess (14,124) for the cable conductor or conductors and wall elements (4,6,8,10;116,118,120,122) of which at least one part carries a claw (16,128). A sleeve or bushing is provided with an entrance for insertion and fixing of the clamp housing (2,112).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 9/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 9/05 (2006.01); H01R 13/658 (2011.01); H01R 43/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 9/0527 (2013.01); H01R 9/0503 (2013.01); H01R 13/65802 (2013.01); H01R 43/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0903809 A2 19990324; EP 0903809 A3 20010418

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040302

2004-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031111

2003-03-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CCS TECHNOLOGY, INC.

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB SE

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011017

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

1999-03-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI